Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 04/14/1999
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 04/14/1999
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 04/14/1999
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/14/1999
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 04/14/1999
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 04/14/1999
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 04/14/1999
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 04/14/1999
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 04/14/1999
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 04/14/1999
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 04/14/1999
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 04/14/1999
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 04/14/1999
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 04/14/1999
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 04/14/1999
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 04/14/1999
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 04/14/1999
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 04/14/1999
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 04/14/1999
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 04/14/1999
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 04/21/1999
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/21/1999
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 04/21/1999
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 04/21/1999
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 04/21/1999
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 04/21/1999
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 04/21/1999
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 04/21/1999
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 04/22/1999
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 04/22/1999
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 04/22/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 04/22/1999
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 04/28/1999
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 04/28/1999
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 04/28/1999
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 04/28/1999
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 04/28/1999
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 04/28/1999
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 04/28/1999
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 04/28/1999
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 04/28/1999
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 04/28/1999
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 04/28/1999
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 04/28/1999
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27] 04/28/1999
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 04/28/1999
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 04/28/1999
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 04/28/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 04/28/1999
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 04/28/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 04/28/1999
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 04/28/1999
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 04/28/1999
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 04/28/1999
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 05/04/1999
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 05/04/1999
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 05/04/1999
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 05/04/1999
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 05/04/1999
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 05/04/1999
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 05/04/1999
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 05/04/1999
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 05/04/1999
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 05/04/1999
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21] 05/04/1999
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 05/04/1999
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 05/06/1999
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 05/06/1999
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 05/06/1999
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 05/06/1999
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 05/06/1999
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 05/06/1999
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 05/06/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 05/06/1999
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 05/06/1999
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 05/13/1999
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 05/13/1999
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 05/13/1999
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 05/13/1999
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 05/13/1999
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 05/18/1999
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 05/18/1999
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/18/1999
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 05/18/1999
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 05/18/1999
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 05/18/1999
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 05/18/1999
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 05/18/1999
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 05/18/1999
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 05/18/1999
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 05/18/1999
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 05/24/1999
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 05/24/1999
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 05/24/1999
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/24/1999
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 05/24/1999
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 05/24/1999
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 05/24/1999
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 05/24/1999
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 05/24/1999
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 05/24/1999
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 05/24/1999
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 05/24/1999
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 05/24/1999
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 05/24/1999
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 05/24/1999
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 05/24/1999
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 06/09/1999
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 06/09/1999
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16] 06/09/1999
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 06/09/1999
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 06/09/1999
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 06/09/1999
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 06/09/1999
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 06/09/1999
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 06/09/1999
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 06/09/1999
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 06/09/1999
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 06/09/1999
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 06/18/1999
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 06/18/1999
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 06/18/1999
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 06/18/1999
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large] 06/18/1999
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 06/18/1999
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/18/1999
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 06/18/1999
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 06/18/1999
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 06/18/1999
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 07/01/1999
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1] 07/01/1999
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 07/01/1999
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 07/01/1999
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 07/01/1999
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 07/01/1999
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 07/01/1999
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 07/21/1999