Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 05/14/1999
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 05/14/1999
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/14/1999
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 05/14/1999
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 05/14/1999
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 05/14/1999
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 05/14/1999
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 05/14/1999
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 05/14/1999
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 05/14/1999
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 05/14/1999
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 05/14/1999
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 05/14/1999
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 05/14/1999
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 06/10/1999
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/10/1999
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 06/10/1999
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 06/10/1999
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 06/10/1999
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/10/1999
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 06/10/1999
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 06/10/1999
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 06/10/1999
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 06/10/1999
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 06/10/1999
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 07/01/1999
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 07/01/1999
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 07/01/1999
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 07/01/1999
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 07/01/1999
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 07/01/1999
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 07/01/1999
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 07/01/1999
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 07/01/1999
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 07/01/1999
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 07/01/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 07/01/1999
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 07/01/1999
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 07/01/1999
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 07/22/1999
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 07/22/1999
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 07/22/1999
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 07/22/1999
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 07/22/1999
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 07/22/1999
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/22/1999
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 07/22/1999
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 07/30/1999
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 07/30/1999
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 07/30/1999
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/30/1999
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 07/30/1999
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 08/05/1999
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 08/05/1999
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 08/05/1999
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 08/05/1999
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 08/05/1999
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 08/05/1999
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 08/05/1999
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 08/05/1999
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 08/05/1999
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 08/05/1999
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 10/04/1999
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 10/04/1999
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 10/04/1999
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 10/04/1999
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 10/04/1999
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/04/1999
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 10/04/1999
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 10/04/1999
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 10/04/1999
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 10/04/1999
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 10/04/1999
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 10/04/1999
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 10/04/1999
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 10/04/1999
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 10/04/1999
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 10/04/1999
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 10/04/1999
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 10/04/1999
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 10/04/1999
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 10/04/1999
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 10/04/1999
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/04/1999
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 10/04/1999
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 10/04/1999
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 11/10/1999
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 11/10/1999
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 11/10/1999
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 11/10/1999
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 11/10/1999
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 11/10/1999
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 11/10/1999
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 11/10/1999
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 11/10/1999
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 11/10/1999
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 11/10/1999
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 11/10/1999
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 11/10/1999
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 11/10/1999
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 11/10/1999
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 11/18/1999
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 11/18/1999
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 02/10/2000
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/10/2000
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 02/10/2000
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 02/10/2000
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 02/10/2000
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [D-NY-1] 02/10/2000
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 02/10/2000
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 02/10/2000
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 02/10/2000
Rep. Kuykendall, Steven T. [R-CA-36] 02/10/2000
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 02/10/2000
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 02/10/2000
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 02/10/2000
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 02/10/2000
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 02/10/2000
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 02/10/2000
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 03/15/2000
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 03/15/2000
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 03/15/2000
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 03/15/2000
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 03/15/2000
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 03/15/2000
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/15/2000
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 03/15/2000
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 03/15/2000
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 03/15/2000
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 03/15/2000
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 04/10/2000
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 04/10/2000
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/10/2000
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 05/02/2000
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 05/15/2000
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/19/2000
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/19/2000
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 06/19/2000
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 07/20/2000
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/20/2000
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 10/02/2000
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 10/02/2000
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10] 10/02/2000
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 10/27/2000
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 10/27/2000
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 10/27/2000