Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 05/14/1999
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 05/14/1999
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 05/14/1999
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/14/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 05/14/1999
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 05/14/1999
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 05/14/1999
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 05/14/1999
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 05/14/1999
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 05/14/1999
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 05/14/1999
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 05/14/1999
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 05/14/1999
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 05/14/1999
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 06/10/1999
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 06/10/1999
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 06/10/1999
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 06/10/1999
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 06/10/1999
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 06/10/1999
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/10/1999
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 06/10/1999
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/10/1999
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 06/10/1999
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 06/10/1999
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 06/10/1999
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 07/01/1999
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 07/01/1999
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/01/1999
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 07/01/1999
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 07/01/1999
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 07/01/1999
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 07/01/1999
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 07/01/1999
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 07/01/1999
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 07/01/1999
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 07/01/1999
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 07/01/1999
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/01/1999
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 07/01/1999
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 07/01/1999
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 07/01/1999
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 07/01/1999
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 07/01/1999
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 07/01/1999
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 07/01/1999
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 07/01/1999
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 07/01/1999
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 07/01/1999
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 07/01/1999
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 07/01/1999
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 07/01/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 07/22/1999
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 07/22/1999
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 07/22/1999
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 07/22/1999
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 07/22/1999
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 07/22/1999
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 07/22/1999
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7] 07/22/1999
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 07/22/1999
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9] 07/22/1999
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 07/22/1999
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 07/22/1999
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/22/1999
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 07/22/1999
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 07/22/1999
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 07/22/1999
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 07/22/1999
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 07/22/1999
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 07/22/1999
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 07/22/1999
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 07/22/1999
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 07/22/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 07/22/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 07/22/1999
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 07/22/1999
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 07/30/1999
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 07/30/1999
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5] 07/30/1999
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 07/30/1999
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 07/30/1999
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 07/30/1999
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 07/30/1999
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 07/30/1999
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 07/30/1999
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 07/30/1999
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/30/1999
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 07/30/1999
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 08/05/1999
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 08/05/1999
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 08/05/1999
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 10/04/1999
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 10/04/1999
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 10/04/1999
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 10/04/1999
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 10/04/1999
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 10/04/1999
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 10/04/1999
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 10/04/1999
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 10/04/1999
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 10/04/1999
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 10/04/1999
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 10/04/1999
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 10/04/1999
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 11/10/1999
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 11/10/1999
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 11/10/1999
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 11/10/1999
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 11/18/1999
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 02/10/2000
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 02/10/2000
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 02/10/2000
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 02/10/2000
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 02/10/2000
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 02/10/2000
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 02/10/2000
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 03/15/2000
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 03/15/2000
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 04/13/2000
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 05/02/2000
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 05/25/2000
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 06/27/2000
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 10/02/2000
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 10/02/2000