Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 05/06/1999
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 06/07/1999
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 06/09/1999
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 06/17/1999
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27] 06/22/1999
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 06/29/1999
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 07/13/1999
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 07/15/1999
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 07/15/1999
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 07/27/1999
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 07/27/1999
Rep. Kuykendall, Steven T. [R-CA-36] 03/09/2000