Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Kuykendall, Steven T. [R-CA-36] 04/20/1999
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 04/20/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 04/20/1999
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 04/20/1999
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 04/20/1999
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 04/20/1999
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 04/20/1999
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/20/1999
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 04/20/1999
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 04/28/1999
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 04/28/1999
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 04/28/1999
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 04/28/1999
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 05/04/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/04/1999
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 05/04/1999
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 05/04/1999
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 05/04/1999
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 05/20/1999
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 05/20/1999
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 05/20/1999
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 05/20/1999
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/20/1999
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 05/24/1999
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 05/24/1999
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 05/24/1999
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 05/24/1999
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/24/1999
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 05/24/1999
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 05/26/1999
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 05/26/1999
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 05/26/1999
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large] 05/26/1999
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 05/26/1999
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 06/07/1999
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 06/07/1999
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 06/07/1999
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/07/1999
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 06/07/1999
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/08/1999
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 06/08/1999
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 06/08/1999
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 06/08/1999
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 06/09/1999
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 06/29/1999
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 06/29/1999
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 06/29/1999