Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 02/04/1999
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 02/04/1999
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 02/04/1999
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 02/04/1999
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 02/04/1999
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 02/04/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/04/1999
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 02/04/1999
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 02/04/1999
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 02/04/1999
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/04/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 02/04/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 02/04/1999
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 02/04/1999
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 02/04/1999
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 02/04/1999
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 02/10/1999
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 02/24/1999
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 02/24/1999
Rep. Portman, Rob [R-OH-2] 02/24/1999
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 02/24/1999
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 02/24/1999
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 02/25/1999
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 02/25/1999
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 03/17/1999
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 03/17/1999
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/24/1999
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/24/1999
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 03/24/1999
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 03/24/1999
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 07/22/1999
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 09/13/1999
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 10/01/1999
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 10/28/1999
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 11/18/1999