Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large]* 03/25/1999
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5]* 03/25/1999
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 04/12/1999
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 04/12/1999
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 04/12/1999
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 04/12/1999
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 04/26/1999
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 04/26/1999
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 04/26/1999
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/26/1999
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 04/26/1999
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 04/28/1999
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/29/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 05/04/1999
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2] 05/05/1999
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 05/05/1999
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 05/11/1999
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 05/11/1999
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 05/20/1999
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 05/20/1999
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/25/1999
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/08/1999
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 06/08/1999
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 06/14/1999
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/14/1999
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/14/1999
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 06/14/1999
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 06/16/1999
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 06/16/1999
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 06/16/1999
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 06/16/1999
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 06/18/1999
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 06/18/1999
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 06/24/1999
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 06/24/1999
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 07/01/1999
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 07/12/1999
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 07/14/1999
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 07/14/1999
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 07/14/1999
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 07/20/1999
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 07/26/1999
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 07/26/1999
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 07/29/1999
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 07/29/1999
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 07/29/1999
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21] 07/30/1999
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/30/1999
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 08/03/1999
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 08/03/1999
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 08/03/1999
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 08/04/1999
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20] 08/05/1999
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 08/05/1999
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 09/08/1999
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 09/08/1999
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 09/08/1999
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 09/08/1999
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 09/08/1999
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 09/15/1999
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 09/23/1999
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 09/23/1999
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 09/23/1999
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 09/29/1999
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 09/29/1999
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 09/29/1999
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 10/01/1999
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 10/01/1999
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 10/01/1999
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 10/06/1999
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 10/21/1999
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 10/26/1999
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 05/17/2000
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 09/07/2000
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 09/07/2000