Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Coburn, Tom [R-OK-2]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 03/25/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 04/12/1999
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 04/14/1999
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 04/20/1999
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 04/20/1999
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1] 04/26/1999
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 04/29/1999
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 04/29/1999
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 05/04/1999
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 05/04/1999
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 05/04/1999
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 05/04/1999
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5] 05/04/1999
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 05/06/1999
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 05/06/1999
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 05/11/1999
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 05/12/1999
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 05/12/1999
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 05/13/1999
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 05/18/1999
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 05/18/1999
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 05/18/1999
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 05/19/1999
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 05/26/1999
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 06/07/1999
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 06/07/1999
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 06/07/1999
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 06/09/1999
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 06/09/1999
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/09/1999
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 07/16/1999
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 09/15/1999
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 09/15/1999
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 09/15/1999
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 10/20/1999
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 10/25/1999
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 10/27/1999
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 11/02/1999
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 02/07/2000
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/09/2000
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 03/16/2000
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 03/21/2000
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 03/21/2000
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/23/2000