Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 04/28/1999
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 04/28/1999
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 04/28/1999
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 04/28/1999
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/28/1999
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 04/28/1999
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 04/28/1999
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 04/28/1999
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 04/28/1999
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 04/28/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 04/28/1999
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/28/1999
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 04/28/1999
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 04/28/1999
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/28/1999
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 04/28/1999
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 04/28/1999
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 04/28/1999
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/08/1999
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/08/1999
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 06/08/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 06/08/1999
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/08/1999
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 06/08/1999
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/08/1999
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 06/08/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 06/08/1999
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 06/08/1999
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 06/08/1999
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 06/08/1999
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 06/24/1999
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/24/1999
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 06/24/1999
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/24/1999
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/24/1999
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 06/24/1999
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/24/1999
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 06/24/1999
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/24/1999
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 06/24/1999
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 07/15/1999
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/09/2000