Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 03/25/1999
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 04/15/1999
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 04/15/1999
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3] 04/15/1999
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 04/15/1999
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 04/15/1999
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 04/27/1999
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 04/27/1999
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 04/28/1999
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 05/04/1999
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large] 05/04/1999
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 05/06/1999
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/19/1999
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 05/25/1999
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 05/25/1999
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 05/25/1999
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 05/27/1999
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 06/09/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 06/09/1999
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 06/09/1999
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 07/01/1999
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 07/01/1999
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 07/01/1999
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 07/01/1999
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 07/21/1999
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 07/21/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 08/04/1999
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 08/04/1999
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 08/04/1999
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 02/10/2000
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 02/10/2000
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 02/10/2000
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 02/10/2000
Rep. Coburn, Tom [R-OK-2] 02/15/2000
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 02/15/2000
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 03/08/2000
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 03/08/2000
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 03/08/2000
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 03/08/2000
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 04/06/2000
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 06/21/2000
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 07/27/2000