Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 01/19/1999
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19] 02/02/1999
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 02/24/1999
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 10/21/1999