Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 03/25/1999
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1]* 03/25/1999
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 05/20/1999
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 05/20/1999
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 07/01/1999
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 07/22/1999
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 08/03/1999
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 08/03/1999
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 09/28/1999
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 09/28/1999
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 09/28/1999
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16] 02/16/2000