Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 04/12/1999
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 04/12/1999
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 04/12/1999
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7]* 04/12/1999
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 04/12/1999
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 04/12/1999
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3]* 04/12/1999
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 04/12/1999
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 04/12/1999
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 04/12/1999
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 04/12/1999
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 04/20/1999
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 04/20/1999
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 04/20/1999
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 04/20/1999
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 04/20/1999
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 04/20/1999
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 04/20/1999
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 04/20/1999
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 04/20/1999
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 04/20/1999
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/20/1999
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 04/20/1999
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6] 04/20/1999
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 04/20/1999
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 04/20/1999
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 04/20/1999
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 04/20/1999
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 04/27/1999
Rep. Dunn, Jennifer [R-WA-8] 04/27/1999
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 04/27/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 04/27/1999
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 04/27/1999
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 04/27/1999
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27] 04/27/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 04/27/1999
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 04/27/1999
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 04/27/1999
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 04/27/1999
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1] 04/27/1999
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 04/27/1999
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 04/27/1999
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 04/27/1999
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 05/05/1999
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 05/05/1999
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 05/18/1999
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 05/18/1999
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/18/1999
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 05/26/1999
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 05/26/1999
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 05/26/1999
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 06/09/1999
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/09/1999
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 06/09/1999
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 06/09/1999
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 06/22/1999
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 06/22/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 06/22/1999
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 06/25/1999
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 06/25/1999
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 07/12/1999
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 07/12/1999
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 07/22/1999
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 07/29/1999
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 09/13/1999
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 09/13/1999
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 02/10/2000
Rep. Bonilla, Henry [R-TX-23] 03/16/2000
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 03/23/2000
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 03/23/2000
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 04/05/2000
Rep. Chenoweth-Hage, Helen [R-ID-1] 04/05/2000
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 04/05/2000
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 04/05/2000
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 04/06/2000
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 04/11/2000
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3] 04/11/2000
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 04/11/2000
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 04/13/2000
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 04/13/2000
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 04/13/2000
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 04/13/2000
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 04/13/2000
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 04/13/2000
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 04/13/2000
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 04/13/2000
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 04/13/2000
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 04/13/2000
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 04/13/2000
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 04/13/2000
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 04/13/2000
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 04/13/2000
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 04/13/2000
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 04/13/2000
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 04/13/2000
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 04/13/2000
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 04/13/2000
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 05/04/2000
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 05/04/2000
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 05/04/2000
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 05/16/2000
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/16/2000
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 05/16/2000
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/16/2000
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 05/16/2000
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22] 06/09/2000
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 06/09/2000
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2] 06/09/2000
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 06/19/2000
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 07/18/2000
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 10/19/2000
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 10/19/2000
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 10/25/2000