Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 05/24/1999
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 06/07/1999
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 06/07/1999
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 06/07/1999
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4] 06/07/1999
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 06/07/1999
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 06/17/1999
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 06/17/1999
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 06/17/1999
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/17/1999
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 06/17/1999
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [D-NY-1] 05/10/2000
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 06/06/2000