Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 04/13/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 04/13/1999
Rep. Chenoweth-Hage, Helen [R-ID-1]* 04/13/1999
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 04/13/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 04/13/1999
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 04/13/1999
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 04/13/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 04/13/1999
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 04/13/1999
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 04/13/1999
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 04/13/1999
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 04/13/1999
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 04/13/1999
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 04/13/1999
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 04/13/1999
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 04/13/1999
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 04/13/1999
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 04/13/1999
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 04/13/1999
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 04/13/1999
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 04/13/1999
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11]* 04/13/1999
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5]* 04/13/1999
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 04/13/1999
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 04/13/1999
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 04/13/1999
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2]* 04/13/1999
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3]* 04/13/1999
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 04/13/1999
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large]* 04/13/1999
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9]* 04/13/1999
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 04/13/1999
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 04/13/1999
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 04/13/1999
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 04/13/1999
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 04/13/1999
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19]* 04/13/1999
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 04/13/1999
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 04/13/1999
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 04/13/1999
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 04/13/1999
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 04/15/1999
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/26/1999
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 04/29/1999
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 04/29/1999
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 05/14/1999
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/07/1999
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 06/07/1999
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 06/10/1999
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 06/18/1999
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 06/18/1999
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 09/08/1999
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 09/21/1999
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 09/21/1999
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 10/04/1999
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 10/04/1999
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 10/04/1999
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 10/04/1999
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 10/04/1999
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 10/04/1999
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 10/04/1999
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 10/04/1999
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 10/26/1999
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 10/26/1999
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 11/10/1999
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 11/18/1999
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 02/01/2000
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 03/28/2000
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 03/28/2000
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6] 03/28/2000
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 04/06/2000
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/06/2000
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 05/04/2000
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 05/04/2000
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 05/24/2000
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/29/2000
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 07/13/2000
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 09/07/2000