Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 04/13/1999
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 04/14/1999
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 04/14/1999
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 04/14/1999
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11] 04/14/1999
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 04/14/1999
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 04/14/1999
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28] 04/14/1999
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 04/14/1999
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 04/14/1999
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2] 04/14/1999
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 04/14/1999
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 04/15/1999
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/20/1999
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 04/20/1999
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 04/27/1999