Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 04/13/1999
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 04/13/1999
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 04/13/1999
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1]* 04/13/1999
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 04/13/1999
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 04/13/1999
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 04/13/1999
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/13/1999
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 04/13/1999
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 04/13/1999
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 04/13/1999
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 04/13/1999
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 04/13/1999
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 04/13/1999
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1]* 04/13/1999
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 04/13/1999
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 04/13/1999
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 04/13/1999
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6]* 04/13/1999
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 04/13/1999
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 04/13/1999
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32]* 04/13/1999
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 04/13/1999
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 04/13/1999
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31]* 04/13/1999
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 04/13/1999
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 04/13/1999
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 04/13/1999
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 04/13/1999
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 04/13/1999
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 04/13/1999
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 04/13/1999
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 04/13/1999
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 04/13/1999
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 04/13/1999
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 04/13/1999
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 04/13/1999
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 04/13/1999
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 04/13/1999
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7]* 04/13/1999
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 04/13/1999
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 04/13/1999
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 04/13/1999
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 04/13/1999
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 04/13/1999
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 04/13/1999
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 04/13/1999
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/23/1999
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/23/1999
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 06/23/1999
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/23/1999
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16] 06/23/1999
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 06/23/1999
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 06/23/1999
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/23/1999
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 06/23/1999
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 06/23/1999
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 06/23/1999
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 06/23/1999
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 06/23/1999
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/23/1999
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/09/1999
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 09/09/1999
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 09/09/1999
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/09/1999
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 09/09/1999
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/09/1999
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 09/09/1999
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 09/09/1999
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 10/19/1999
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 11/18/1999
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 11/18/1999
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 02/16/2000
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 02/16/2000
Rep. Christensen, Donna MC [D-VI-At Large] 03/01/2000
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/01/2000
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3] 03/01/2000
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 04/04/2000
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 04/11/2000
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 06/06/2000
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 06/06/2000
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/06/2000
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 06/07/2000
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/07/2000
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/07/2000
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 06/07/2000
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/08/2000
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/26/2000
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 07/26/2000
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/27/2000
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 07/27/2000
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 09/07/2000
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 09/07/2000
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 09/07/2000
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 09/07/2000
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 09/18/2000
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 09/28/2000
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 10/18/2000
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 10/18/2000

Show cosponsors who withdrew