Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 04/14/1999
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 04/14/1999
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 04/14/1999
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 04/14/1999
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 04/14/1999
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 04/14/1999
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 04/14/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 04/14/1999
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 04/14/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 04/14/1999
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 04/14/1999
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 04/14/1999
Rep. Christensen, Donna MC [D-VI-At Large]* 04/14/1999
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 04/14/1999
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 04/14/1999
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large]* 04/14/1999
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 04/14/1999
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 04/14/1999
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 04/14/1999
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 04/14/1999
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 04/14/1999
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 04/14/1999
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 04/14/1999
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 04/14/1999
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 04/14/1999
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/14/1999
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 04/14/1999
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19]* 04/14/1999
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 04/14/1999
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 04/14/1999
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/24/1999
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/24/1999
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/24/1999
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 06/24/1999
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 06/24/1999
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/24/1999
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/24/1999
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/24/1999
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/24/1999
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 06/24/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/24/1999
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 06/24/1999
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 06/24/1999
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 06/24/1999
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/24/1999
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/24/1999
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/09/1999
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 09/09/1999
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 09/09/1999
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 09/09/1999
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/09/1999
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 09/09/1999
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 09/09/1999
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 09/09/1999
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 09/09/1999
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 09/09/1999
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 09/09/1999
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 09/09/1999
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 09/09/1999
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 10/05/1999
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 10/05/1999
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 10/05/1999
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 10/05/1999
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 10/05/1999
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 11/18/1999
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 11/18/1999
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 11/18/1999
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 11/18/1999
Rep. Kuykendall, Steven T. [R-CA-36] 11/18/1999
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 11/18/1999
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 11/18/1999
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 01/24/2000
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 02/15/2000
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 02/15/2000
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 03/09/2000
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 03/09/2000
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 06/14/2000
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 06/28/2000
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 07/12/2000
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 07/12/2000
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 10/03/2000
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 10/10/2000