Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7]* 04/15/1999
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5]* 04/15/1999
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 04/15/1999
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 04/15/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 05/11/1999
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 05/11/1999
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 05/11/1999
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/11/1999
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/19/1999
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 05/19/1999
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/24/1999
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 09/08/1999
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 02/01/2000
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/09/2000
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 05/09/2000
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 06/09/2000
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 10/05/2000