Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 04/15/1999
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 04/21/1999
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 05/05/1999
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/05/1999
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 06/07/1999
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 09/22/1999
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3] 09/22/1999
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 10/06/1999
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 10/26/1999
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 10/26/1999
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 02/16/2000
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 02/16/2000
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 03/06/2000
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 03/23/2000
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 05/04/2000