Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3]* 04/15/1999
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8]* 04/15/1999
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 04/15/1999
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 04/15/1999
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29]* 04/15/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 04/15/1999
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 04/15/1999
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 04/15/1999
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 04/15/1999
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 04/15/1999
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 04/15/1999
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7]* 04/15/1999
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 04/15/1999
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 04/15/1999
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 04/15/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 04/15/1999
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27]* 04/15/1999
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 04/15/1999
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 04/15/1999
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3]* 04/15/1999
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 04/15/1999
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6]* 04/15/1999
Rep. Romero-Barcelo, Carlos A. [D-PR-At Large]* 04/15/1999
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22]* 04/15/1999
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 04/15/1999
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 04/15/1999
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 04/15/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 04/15/1999
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 04/15/1999
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32]* 04/15/1999
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9]* 04/15/1999
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 04/15/1999
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 04/15/1999
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 04/15/1999
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2]* 04/15/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 04/15/1999
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 04/15/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 04/15/1999
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 04/15/1999
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 04/15/1999
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 04/15/1999
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 04/15/1999
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 04/15/1999
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 04/15/1999
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1]* 04/15/1999
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10]* 04/15/1999
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12]* 04/15/1999
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 04/15/1999
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 04/29/1999
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 04/29/1999
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 04/29/1999
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 04/29/1999
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 04/29/1999
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 04/29/1999
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 04/29/1999
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 04/29/1999
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 04/29/1999
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 04/29/1999
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 04/29/1999
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 04/29/1999
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 04/29/1999
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 04/29/1999
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 04/29/1999
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 04/29/1999
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 06/10/1999
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 06/10/1999
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51] 06/10/1999
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 06/10/1999
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/10/1999
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 06/10/1999
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 06/10/1999
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 06/10/1999
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 06/10/1999
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 06/10/1999
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 06/10/1999
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 06/10/1999
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 06/10/1999
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 06/10/1999
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 06/10/1999
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 06/10/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 06/10/1999
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 06/10/1999
Rep. Kuykendall, Steven T. [R-CA-36] 06/10/1999
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 06/10/1999
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 06/10/1999
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 06/10/1999
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 09/22/1999
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 11/18/1999
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 03/30/2000
Rep. Baca, Joe [D-CA-42] 06/14/2000