Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 02/02/1999
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 02/02/1999
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 02/02/1999
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 02/02/1999
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 02/02/1999
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 02/02/1999
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 02/02/1999
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 02/02/1999
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 02/02/1999
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 02/02/1999
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 02/02/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 02/02/1999
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 02/02/1999
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 02/02/1999
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 02/02/1999
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 02/25/1999
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 02/25/1999
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 02/25/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 02/25/1999
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 02/25/1999
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 02/25/1999
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 02/25/1999
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 02/25/1999
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 02/25/1999
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 02/25/1999
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 03/25/1999
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 03/25/1999
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 03/25/1999
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 04/20/1999
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 04/20/1999
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 05/06/1999
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 05/06/1999
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 05/06/1999
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 05/13/1999
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/13/1999
Rep. Ortiz, Solomon P. [D-TX-27] 06/24/1999
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 06/24/1999
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 09/22/1999
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 09/22/1999
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 10/04/1999
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 10/04/1999
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 11/02/1999
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 11/08/1999
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 11/18/1999
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 02/15/2000
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 02/15/2000
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 02/15/2000
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7] 02/15/2000
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 02/15/2000
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 02/15/2000
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 02/15/2000
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 03/01/2000
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/01/2000
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 03/22/2000
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large] 03/22/2000
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 04/03/2000
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 04/03/2000
Rep. Coburn, Tom [R-OK-2] 05/02/2000
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 05/02/2000
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 05/02/2000
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 05/02/2000
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7] 05/18/2000
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 05/18/2000
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 06/19/2000
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 06/29/2000
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 07/24/2000
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 07/27/2000
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 09/07/2000
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 09/19/2000