Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Hastert, J. Dennis [R-IL-14]* 04/20/1999
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7]* 04/20/1999
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Chabot, Steve [R-OH-1]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Hoekstra, Peter [R-MI-2]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Burton, Dan [R-IN-6]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4]* 04/20/1999
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large]* 04/20/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Coburn, Tom [R-OK-2]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Chenoweth-Hage, Helen [R-ID-1]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11]* 04/20/1999
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41]* 04/20/1999
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Barton, Joe [R-TX-6]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Regula, Ralph [R-OH-16]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43]* 04/20/1999
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Kuykendall, Steven T. [R-CA-36]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 04/27/1999
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6] 05/05/1999
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 05/05/1999
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10] 05/11/1999
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 05/20/1999
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25] 05/24/1999
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 05/26/1999
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 06/10/1999
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 07/13/1999
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 07/14/1999
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 07/19/1999
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 09/30/1999
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 10/01/1999
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 11/18/1999
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4] 01/27/2000
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 02/29/2000
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 02/29/2000
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 03/08/2000
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 03/08/2000
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 06/06/2000
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 06/06/2000
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 10/11/2000