Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 04/20/1999
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19]* 04/20/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 04/20/1999
Rep. Christensen, Donna MC [D-VI-At Large] 04/21/1999
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 04/21/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 04/21/1999
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 04/21/1999
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 04/27/1999
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 04/27/1999
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 04/27/1999
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 04/27/1999
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 04/27/1999
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 04/27/1999
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 05/06/1999
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 05/06/1999
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 06/08/1999
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 06/08/1999
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 06/08/1999
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/08/1999
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12] 06/08/1999
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 06/08/1999
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 06/09/1999
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 07/20/1999
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/29/1999
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 08/02/1999