Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 04/21/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 06/09/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/09/1999
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 06/09/1999
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 06/09/1999
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 06/09/1999
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 06/09/1999
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 06/09/1999
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 06/09/1999
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 06/30/1999
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 06/30/1999
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 08/05/1999
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 03/08/2000
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2] 03/15/2000
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 03/21/2000
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 04/11/2000
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 10/02/2000