Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 04/21/1999
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 04/21/1999
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1]* 04/21/1999
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 04/21/1999
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 04/21/1999
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 04/21/1999
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 04/21/1999
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 04/21/1999
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 04/21/1999
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 04/21/1999
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6]* 04/21/1999
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7]* 04/21/1999
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 04/21/1999
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 04/21/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 04/21/1999
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41]* 04/21/1999
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 04/21/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 04/21/1999
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 04/21/1999
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6]* 04/21/1999
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 04/21/1999
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 04/21/1999
Rep. Granger, Kay [R-TX-12]* 04/21/1999
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4]* 04/21/1999
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 04/21/1999
Rep. Chenoweth-Hage, Helen [R-ID-1]* 04/21/1999
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9]* 04/21/1999
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5]* 04/21/1999
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 04/21/1999
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 04/21/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 04/21/1999
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 04/21/1999
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 04/21/1999
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 04/21/1999
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 04/21/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 04/21/1999
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 04/21/1999
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2]* 04/21/1999
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 04/21/1999
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 04/21/1999
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4]* 04/21/1999
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32]* 04/21/1999
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 04/21/1999
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 04/21/1999
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1]* 04/21/1999
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 04/21/1999
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19]* 04/21/1999
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 04/21/1999
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 04/21/1999
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 04/21/1999
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 04/21/1999
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5]* 04/21/1999
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 04/21/1999
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15]* 04/21/1999
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 04/21/1999
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13] 06/23/1999
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 06/23/1999
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 06/23/1999
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 06/23/1999
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 06/23/1999
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 06/23/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 06/23/1999
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3] 06/23/1999
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 10/25/1999
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 03/09/2000
Rep. Fowler, Tillie [R-FL-4] 03/09/2000
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 03/09/2000
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 03/09/2000
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 03/09/2000
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 03/09/2000
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16] 03/09/2000
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 03/23/2000
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 03/23/2000
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 03/23/2000
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 03/23/2000