Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2]* 04/21/1999
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 04/21/1999
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 04/21/1999
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 04/21/1999
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22]* 04/21/1999
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 04/21/1999
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 04/21/1999
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 04/21/1999
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 04/21/1999
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 04/21/1999
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/21/1999
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 04/21/1999
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 04/21/1999
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 04/21/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 04/21/1999
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 04/21/1999
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 04/21/1999
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 04/21/1999
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8]* 04/21/1999
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 04/21/1999
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 04/21/1999
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 04/21/1999
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/17/1999
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 05/17/1999
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/17/1999
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 05/17/1999
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 05/17/1999
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 05/17/1999
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/17/1999
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 05/17/1999
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 05/17/1999
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/17/1999
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/17/1999
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 06/08/1999
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/08/1999
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 06/08/1999
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 06/08/1999
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 06/08/1999
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 06/08/1999
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 06/08/1999
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 06/08/1999
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 06/08/1999
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 06/08/1999
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 06/08/1999
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 06/08/1999
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 06/08/1999
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 06/08/1999
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 06/08/1999
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9] 06/08/1999
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/08/1999
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 06/08/1999
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 06/08/1999
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 06/08/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 06/08/1999
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 06/08/1999
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 06/08/1999
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/08/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 06/29/1999
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 06/29/1999
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 06/29/1999
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 06/29/1999
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 06/29/1999
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 06/29/1999
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 06/29/1999
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 06/29/1999
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 06/29/1999
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 06/29/1999
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 06/29/1999
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 06/29/1999
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 06/29/1999
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 06/29/1999
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 06/29/1999
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 07/19/1999
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 07/19/1999
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 07/19/1999
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 07/19/1999
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1] 07/19/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 07/19/1999
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 07/19/1999
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 07/19/1999
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 07/19/1999
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 07/30/1999
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 07/30/1999
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/30/1999
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 07/30/1999
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 07/30/1999
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 07/30/1999
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 09/28/1999
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 09/28/1999
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 09/28/1999
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 11/02/1999
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 11/02/1999
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 11/02/1999
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46] 11/17/1999
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 11/17/1999
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 11/17/1999
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 01/27/2000
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 01/27/2000
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 01/27/2000
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14] 01/27/2000
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 02/29/2000
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/16/2000
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 03/16/2000
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 03/16/2000
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 04/10/2000
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 04/10/2000
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 04/10/2000
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 04/13/2000
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 04/13/2000
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 06/12/2000
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 07/11/2000
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 10/02/2000
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 10/11/2000
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 10/18/2000