Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 04/22/1999
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 04/22/1999
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4]* 04/22/1999
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large]* 04/22/1999
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 04/22/1999
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 04/22/1999
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 04/22/1999
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 04/22/1999
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 04/22/1999
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 04/22/1999
Rep. Cubin, Barbara [R-WY-At Large]* 04/22/1999
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 04/22/1999
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2]* 04/22/1999
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 04/22/1999
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 05/13/1999
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 05/13/1999
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 05/13/1999
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 05/26/1999
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 06/24/1999
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 06/24/1999
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45] 06/24/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 09/08/1999
Rep. Knollenberg, Joe [R-MI-11] 09/23/1999
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 09/23/1999
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 02/10/2000
Rep. Skeen, Joe [R-NM-2] 04/05/2000
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 04/05/2000
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 04/05/2000
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 04/05/2000
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large] 04/05/2000
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 04/05/2000
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21] 04/11/2000
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 04/11/2000
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52] 04/13/2000
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 05/03/2000
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 05/03/2000
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/03/2000