There are 2 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Public Forests Emergency Act of 1999

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To authorize the continued use on public lands of the expedited processes successfully used for windstorm-damaged national forests and grasslands in Texas.


Actions Overview (2)

Date
10/31/2000Reported by the Committee on Resources. H. Rept. 106-1021.
04/22/1999Introduced in House

All Actions (10)

Date
10/31/2000Placed on the Union Calendar, Calendar No. 592.
Action By: House of Representatives
10/31/2000Reported by the Committee on Resources. H. Rept. 106-1021.
06/09/1999Ordered to be Reported by the Yeas and Nays: 21 - 8.
06/09/1999Committee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
05/05/1999Executive Comment Received from Interior.
04/27/1999Forwarded by Subcommittee to Full Committee (Amended) by the Yeas and Nays: 8 - 6.
Action By: House Resources Subcommittee on Forests and Forest Health
04/27/1999Subcommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
Action By: House Resources Subcommittee on Forests and Forest Health
04/26/1999Referred to the Subcommittee on Forests and Forest Health.
Action By: Committee on Resources
04/22/1999Referred to the House Committee on Resources.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/22/1999Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Resources04/22/1999 Referred to
06/09/1999 Markup by
10/31/2000 Reported by H. Rept. 106-1021
House Resources Subcommittee on Forests and Forest Health04/26/1999 Referred to
04/27/1999 Markup by
04/27/1999 Reported by

No related bill information was received for H.R.1524.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1524. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/22/1999)

Public Forests Emergency Act of 1999 - Directs the Secretaries of Agriculture and the Interior to request authority to remove dead, downed, or severely root-sprung trees in a similar manner to arrangements approved for national forests and grasslands in Texas in 1998 for specified public and forest lands in: (1) Alaska; (2) Idaho; (3) Oregon; (4) South Dakota; (5) California; (6) Pennsylvania; (7) Mississippi; (8) Virginia; (9) Arkansas; (10) Louisiana; (11) North Carolina; (12) Kentucky; (13) Alabama (14) Tennessee; and (15) Florida.