Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 04/27/1999
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 04/27/1999
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6]* 04/27/1999
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 04/27/1999
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 04/27/1999
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 04/27/1999
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 04/27/1999
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 04/27/1999
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15]* 04/27/1999
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 04/27/1999
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7]* 04/27/1999
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 04/27/1999
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 04/27/1999
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1]* 04/27/1999
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4]* 04/27/1999
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 04/27/1999
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 04/27/1999
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 04/27/1999
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 04/27/1999
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 04/27/1999
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 04/27/1999
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 04/27/1999
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24]* 04/27/1999
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 04/27/1999
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 04/27/1999
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2]* 04/27/1999
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 04/27/1999
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 04/27/1999
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 04/27/1999
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 04/27/1999
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 04/27/1999
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 04/27/1999
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 04/27/1999
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 04/27/1999
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 04/27/1999
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 04/27/1999
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1]* 04/27/1999
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 04/27/1999
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 04/27/1999
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 04/27/1999
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25]* 04/27/1999
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 04/27/1999
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5]* 04/27/1999
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/27/1999
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 04/27/1999
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 04/27/1999
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 04/27/1999
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 04/27/1999
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 04/27/1999
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 04/27/1999
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 04/27/1999
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 04/27/1999
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 04/27/1999
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 04/27/1999
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 04/27/1999
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 04/27/1999
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 04/27/1999
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 04/27/1999
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 04/27/1999
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6]* 04/27/1999
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 04/28/1999
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 04/28/1999
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 06/10/1999
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 06/10/1999
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/10/1999
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/10/1999
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/10/1999
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/10/1999
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 06/10/1999
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40] 06/10/1999
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 06/10/1999
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 06/10/1999
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 07/13/1999
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 07/13/1999
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 07/13/1999
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12] 07/13/1999
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 07/13/1999
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 07/13/1999
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 07/13/1999
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3] 07/13/1999
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 07/13/1999
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 07/13/1999
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 07/13/1999
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 07/13/1999
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 07/13/1999
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 08/04/1999
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 08/04/1999
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23] 08/04/1999
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 08/04/1999
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 08/04/1999
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 08/05/1999
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/27/1999
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7] 09/27/1999
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 09/27/1999
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 09/27/1999
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 11/17/1999
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 06/14/2000
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 06/19/2000