Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gephardt, Richard A. [D-MO-3]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 04/28/1999
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 04/28/1999
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32]* 04/28/1999
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 04/28/1999
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 04/28/1999
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 05/05/1999
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13] 05/05/1999
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 05/12/1999
Rep. Christensen, Donna MC [D-VI-At Large] 05/12/1999
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 05/25/1999
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 06/10/1999
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/23/1999
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 07/12/1999
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 07/20/1999
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 10/07/1999
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 04/04/2000
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 06/19/2000
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 06/20/2000
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 06/22/2000
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 06/23/2000
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 06/29/2000
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6] 07/19/2000
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 07/26/2000
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 07/27/2000