Text: H.R.1595 — 106th Congress (1999-2000)All Information (Except Text)

There is one version of the bill.

Text available as:

  • TXT
  • PDF (PDF provides a complete and accurate display of this text.) Tip?

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/28/1999)

 
[Congressional Bills 106th Congress]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]
[H.R. 1595 Introduced in House (IH)]







106th CONGRESS
  1st Session
                                H. R. 1595

   To amend title 23, United States Code, to provide for a national 
  standard to prohibit the operation of motor vehicles by individuals 
                    under the influence of alcohol.


_______________________________________________________________________


                    IN THE HOUSE OF REPRESENTATIVES

                             April 28, 1999

 Mrs. Lowey (for herself, Mr. Wolf, Mr. Canady of Florida, Mr. Towns, 
  Mr. Castle, Mrs. Morella, Mr. Weygand, Mr. Inslee, Mr. Rothman, Mr. 
 Brown of Ohio, Ms. Schakowsky, Mr. LaFalce, Ms. DeLauro, Mr. Markey, 
   Mr. Deutsch, Mr. Waxman, Mr. Lantos, Mr. Capuano, Mr. Forbes, Mr. 
 Gilman, Mr. Cummings, and Mrs. Capps) introduced the following bill; 
       which was referred to the Committee on Transportation and 
                             Infrastructure

_______________________________________________________________________

                                 A BILL


 
   To amend title 23, United States Code, to provide for a national 
  standard to prohibit the operation of motor vehicles by individuals 
                    under the influence of alcohol.

    Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the 
United States of America in Congress assembled,

SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE.

    This Act may be cited as the ``Safe and Sober Streets Act of 
1999''.

SEC. 2. NATIONAL STANDARD TO PROHIBIT OPERATION OF MOTOR VEHICLES BY 
              INDIVIDUALS UNDER THE INFLUENCE OF ALCOHOL.

    (a) In General.--Subchapter I of chapter 1 of title 23, United 
States Code, is amended by adding at the end the following:
``Sec. 165. National standard to prohibit the operation of motor 
              vehicles by individuals under the influence of alcohol
    ``(a) Withholding of Apportionments for Noncompliance.--
            ``(1) Fiscal year 2003.--The Secretary shall withhold 5 
        percent of the amount required to be apportioned to any State 
        under each of paragraphs (1), (3), and (4) of section 104(b) on 
        October 1, 2002, if the State does not meet the requirements of 
        paragraph (3) on such date.
            ``(2) Thereafter.--The Secretary shall withhold 10 percent 
        (including any amounts withheld under paragraph (1)) of the 
        amount required to be apportioned to any State under each of 
        paragraphs (1), (3), and (4) of section 104(b) on October 1, 
        2003, and on October 1 of each fiscal year thereafter, if the 
        State does not meet the requirements of paragraph (3) on such 
        date.
            ``(3) Requirements.--A State meets the requirements of this 
        paragraph if the State has enacted and is enforcing a law 
        providing that an individual who has a blood alcohol 
        concentration of 0.08 percent or greater while operating a 
        motor vehicle in the State is guilty of driving while 
        intoxicated (or an equivalent offense under the law of the 
        State for operating a motor vehicle after having consumed 
        alcohol).
    ``(b) Period of Availability; Effect of Compliance and 
Noncompliance.--
            ``(1) Period of availability of withheld funds.--
                    ``(A) Funds withheld on or before september 30, 
                2004.--Any funds withheld under subsection (a) from 
                apportionment to any State on or before September 30, 
                2004, shall remain available until the end of the third 
                fiscal year following the fiscal year for which such 
                funds are authorized to be appropriated.
                    ``(B) Funds withheld after september 30, 2004.--No 
                funds withheld under this section from apportionment to 
                any State after September 30, 2004, shall be available 
                for apportionment to such State.
            ``(2) Apportionment of withheld funds after compliance.--
        If, before the last day of the period for which funds withheld 
        under subsection (a) from apportionment are to remain available 
        for apportionment to a State under paragraph (1)(A), the State 
        meets the requirement of subsection (a)(3), the Secretary 
        shall, on the first day on which the State meets such 
        requirement, apportion to the State the funds withheld under 
        subsection (a) that remain available for apportionment to the 
        State.
            ``(3) Period of availability of subsequently apportioned 
        funds.--Any funds apportioned pursuant to paragraph (2) shall 
        remain available for expenditure until the end of the third 
        fiscal year following the fiscal year in which such funds are 
        so apportioned.
            ``(4) Effect of noncompliance.--If, at the end of the 
        period for which funds withheld under subsection (a) from 
        apportionment are available for apportionment to a State under 
        paragraph (1), the State does not meet the requirement of 
        subsection (a)(3), such funds shall lapse.''.
    (b) Clerical Amendment.--The analysis for such subchapter is 
amended by adding at the end the following:

``165. National standard to prohibit the operation of motor vehicles by 
                            individuals under the influence of 
                            alcohol.''.
                                 <all>