Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 05/06/1999
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 05/06/1999
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 05/19/1999
Rep. Cannon, Chris [R-UT-3] 05/19/1999
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 05/19/1999
Rep. Archer, Bill [R-TX-7] 05/24/1999
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1] 05/26/1999
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 06/09/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/09/1999
Rep. Hyde, Henry J. [R-IL-6] 06/16/1999
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/16/1999
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 06/22/1999
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 06/22/1999
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 06/22/1999
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 06/22/1999
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 06/22/1999
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 06/30/1999
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 06/30/1999
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 06/30/1999
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 07/01/1999
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/01/1999
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 07/13/1999
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 07/20/1999
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 07/20/1999
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10] 07/20/1999
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 07/20/1999
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 07/20/1999
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 07/29/1999
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 07/29/1999
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3] 07/29/1999
Rep. Thornberry, Mac [R-TX-13] 07/30/1999
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7] 07/30/1999
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 07/30/1999
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 09/08/1999
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 09/08/1999
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 09/08/1999
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 09/14/1999
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 09/14/1999
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 09/23/1999
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 09/23/1999
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6] 09/23/1999
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 09/23/1999
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 10/04/1999
Rep. Istook, Ernest J., Jr. [R-OK-5] 10/06/1999
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 10/06/1999
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 10/06/1999
Rep. Hobson, David L. [R-OH-7] 10/19/1999
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 10/19/1999
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 10/26/1999
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 10/26/1999
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 10/26/1999
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1] 10/26/1999
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 02/08/2000
Rep. Northup, Anne M. [R-KY-3] 02/08/2000

Show cosponsors who withdrew