Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 04/28/1999
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Callahan, Sonny [R-AL-1]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Riley, Bob [R-AL-3]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 04/28/1999
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 04/28/1999
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Norwood, Charles W. [R-GA-10]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 04/28/1999
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7]* 04/28/1999
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Tauzin, W. J. (Billy) [R-LA-3]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 04/28/1999
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9]* 04/28/1999
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Ballenger, Cass [R-NC-10]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Jones, Walter B., Jr. [R-NC-3]* 04/28/1999
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 04/28/1999
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Fossella, Vito [R-NY-13]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 04/28/1999
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3]* 04/28/1999
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 04/28/1999
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Reynolds, Thomas M. [R-NY-27]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25]* 04/28/1999
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Coburn, Tom [R-OK-2]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 04/28/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Peterson, John E. [R-PA-5]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Shuster, Bud [R-PA-9]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Jenkins, William L. [R-TN-1]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Wolf, Frank R. [R-VA-10]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2]* 04/28/1999
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 05/25/1999
Rep. Aderholt, Robert B. [R-AL-4] 05/25/1999
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/25/1999
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/25/1999
Rep. Rogers, Harold [R-KY-5] 05/25/1999
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 05/25/1999
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 05/25/1999
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 05/25/1999
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 07/14/1999
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 07/14/1999
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 08/02/1999
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 09/09/1999
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 03/29/2000

Show cosponsors who withdrew