Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 05/04/1999
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 05/04/1999
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/04/1999
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 05/04/1999
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/04/1999
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/04/1999
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 05/04/1999
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/04/1999
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20] 05/04/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 05/04/1999
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 05/06/1999
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 05/06/1999
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 05/06/1999
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/06/1999
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 05/06/1999
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 05/12/1999
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 05/12/1999
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 05/12/1999
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 05/12/1999
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 05/12/1999
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17] 05/12/1999
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 05/12/1999
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 05/12/1999
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/12/1999
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9] 05/14/1999
Rep. Shaw, E. Clay, Jr. [R-FL-22] 05/19/1999
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 05/19/1999
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 05/25/1999
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 05/25/1999
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 06/09/1999
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17] 06/09/1999
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 06/09/1999
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 06/15/1999
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 06/15/1999
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 06/15/1999
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 06/18/1999
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18] 06/24/1999
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 06/24/1999
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 06/30/1999
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 06/30/1999
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 06/30/1999
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 06/30/1999
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 07/15/1999
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 07/15/1999
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 07/15/1999
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 07/15/1999
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 07/15/1999
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 07/15/1999
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 07/19/1999
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10] 07/19/1999
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 07/19/1999
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 07/27/1999
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 07/27/1999
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 07/27/1999
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 07/29/1999
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 07/29/1999
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 08/03/1999
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 08/04/1999
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 09/14/1999
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 09/14/1999
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 09/14/1999
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 09/14/1999
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 09/14/1999
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 09/14/1999
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 09/23/1999
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 09/23/1999
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 10/12/1999
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 10/19/1999
Rep. Mascara, Frank [D-PA-20] 10/20/1999
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 10/20/1999
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 10/27/1999
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 11/03/1999
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 11/08/1999
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 11/09/1999
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 11/09/1999
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 11/09/1999
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 11/17/1999
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 01/27/2000
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 01/27/2000
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 01/27/2000
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 01/27/2000
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4] 02/14/2000
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 03/08/2000
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/15/2000
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 03/15/2000
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 03/29/2000
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 05/02/2000
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 05/02/2000
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 05/09/2000
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5] 05/16/2000
Rep. Whitfield, Ed [R-KY-1] 05/16/2000
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 06/09/2000
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 06/14/2000
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 07/26/2000
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [I-VA-5] 07/27/2000
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 09/12/2000
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 09/12/2000
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 09/13/2000
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 09/19/2000