There is 1 version of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (2)

Short Titles

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Introduced

Rural Teachers Recruitment Act of 1999

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To provide grants to rural eligible local educational agencies to enable the agencies to recruit and retain qualified teachers.


Actions Overview (1)

Date
04/29/1999Introduced in House

All Actions (4)

Date
05/21/1999Referred to the Subcommittee on Postsecondary Education, Training and Life-Long Learning.
Action By: Committee on Education and the Workforce
04/29/1999Referred to the House Committee on Education and the Workforce.
Action By: House of Representatives
04/29/1999Sponsor introductory remarks on measure. (CR H2475)
Action By: House of Representatives
04/29/1999Introduced in House
Action By: House of Representatives

Cosponsors (72)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5]* 04/29/1999
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 04/29/1999
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Christensen, Donna MC [D-VI-At Large]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Chenoweth-Hage, Helen [R-ID-1] 05/11/1999
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 05/11/1999
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 05/11/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 05/11/1999
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 05/11/1999
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 05/11/1999
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/11/1999
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 05/11/1999
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17] 05/11/1999
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 05/11/1999
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 05/20/1999
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 05/20/1999
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 05/20/1999
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 05/20/1999
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 05/20/1999
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4] 05/20/1999
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 05/20/1999
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 05/20/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 05/20/1999
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 06/09/1999
Rep. Burr, Richard [R-NC-5] 06/09/1999
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 06/09/1999
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 06/09/1999
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8] 06/09/1999
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 06/09/1999
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 06/09/1999
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 06/10/1999
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 06/10/1999
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 06/10/1999
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 06/10/1999
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 06/30/1999
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 06/30/1999
Rep. Hayes, Robin [R-NC-8] 06/30/1999
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/20/1999
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 07/27/1999
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 07/27/1999
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 07/27/1999
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1] 07/27/1999
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 08/04/1999
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 08/04/1999
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 09/15/1999
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 09/15/1999
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 09/15/1999
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 09/23/1999

Committees (1)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Education and the Workforce04/29/1999 Referred to
House Education and the Workforce Subcommittee on Postsecondary Education, Training and Life-Long Learning05/21/1999 Referred to

No related bill information was received for H.R.1629.


Latest Summary (1)

There is one summary for H.R.1629. View summaries

Shown Here:
Introduced in House (04/29/1999)

Rural Teachers Recruitment Act of 1999 - Authorizes the Secretary of Education to make grants to eligible rural local educational agencies to recruit and retain qualified teachers for elementary and secondary schools.

Includes among authorized uses of such teacher incentive program funds: (1) salary increases; (2) reimbursement for teacher certification and relocation expenses; and (3) assistance to pay college and graduate school tuition and training expenses.

Authorizes appropriations.