Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 05/13/1999
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 05/13/1999
Rep. McCrery, Jim [R-LA-4] 05/13/1999
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 05/13/1999
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 05/13/1999
Rep. Hilleary, Van [R-TN-4] 05/13/1999
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/13/1999
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 05/13/1999
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 05/13/1999
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 05/13/1999
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 05/13/1999
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/13/1999
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 05/25/1999
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 05/25/1999
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11] 05/25/1999
Rep. Tiahrt, Todd [R-KS-4] 06/08/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 06/08/1999
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 06/08/1999
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 06/08/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 06/08/1999
Rep. McCollum, Bill [R-FL-8] 06/08/1999
Rep. Kingston, Jack [R-GA-1] 06/08/1999
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 06/08/1999
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 06/08/1999
Rep. Goode, Virgil H., Jr. [D-VA-5] 06/17/1999
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 06/24/1999
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 06/24/1999
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 07/16/1999
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 07/16/1999
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 07/22/1999
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 08/05/1999
Rep. Goodlatte, Bob [R-VA-6] 09/09/1999
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 09/09/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 10/14/1999
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 01/31/2000
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 02/29/2000
Rep. Talent, Jim [R-MO-2] 05/04/2000
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 05/04/2000
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 05/10/2000
Rep. Pickering, Charles W. "Chip" [R-MS-3] 05/10/2000
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 05/10/2000
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 05/10/2000
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/10/2000
Rep. Wicker, Roger F. [R-MS-1] 05/10/2000
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2] 05/16/2000
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 05/16/2000
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 06/06/2000
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 06/26/2000
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 06/26/2000
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 07/20/2000
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 07/20/2000