Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 04/29/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7]* 04/29/1999
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 04/29/1999
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 04/29/1999
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 04/29/1999
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 04/29/1999
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4] 05/05/1999
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/05/1999
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 05/05/1999
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 05/05/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 05/05/1999
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2] 05/05/1999
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 05/05/1999
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 05/05/1999
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 05/05/1999
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 05/05/1999
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 05/05/1999
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 05/05/1999
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 05/05/1999
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6] 05/05/1999
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5] 05/05/1999
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 05/13/1999
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14] 05/13/1999
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 05/13/1999
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 05/13/1999
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 05/13/1999
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 05/13/1999
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 05/13/1999
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10] 05/13/1999
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4] 05/13/1999
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/13/1999
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 05/13/1999
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 05/13/1999
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10] 05/13/1999
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 05/13/1999
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5] 05/13/1999
Rep. Berry, Marion [D-AR-1] 05/13/1999
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 05/13/1999
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 05/13/1999
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 05/13/1999
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 05/13/1999
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4] 05/13/1999
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 05/13/1999
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 05/20/1999
Rep. Clayton, Eva M. [D-NC-1] 05/20/1999
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 05/20/1999
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/20/1999
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/20/1999
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13] 05/20/1999
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 05/20/1999
Rep. Mollohan, Alan B. [D-WV-1] 05/20/1999
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 05/20/1999
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 05/27/1999
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26] 05/27/1999
Rep. Hinojosa, Ruben [D-TX-15] 05/27/1999
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/27/1999
Rep. Kanjorski, Paul E. [D-PA-11] 05/27/1999
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5] 05/27/1999
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 05/27/1999
Rep. Rodriguez, Ciro D. [D-TX-28] 05/27/1999
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14] 05/27/1999
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 05/27/1999
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 05/27/1999
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 05/27/1999
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14] 05/27/1999
Rep. Stupak, Bart [D-MI-1] 05/27/1999
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 05/27/1999
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/27/1999
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31] 05/27/1999
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 05/27/1999
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 05/27/1999
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 05/27/1999
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7] 05/27/1999
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 05/27/1999
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4] 05/27/1999
Rep. Clement, Bob [D-TN-5] 05/27/1999
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18] 05/27/1999
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 05/27/1999
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 05/27/1999
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 05/27/1999
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 05/27/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 05/27/1999
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 05/27/1999
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 05/27/1999
Rep. Fattah, Chaka [D-PA-2] 05/27/1999
Rep. Pastor, Ed [D-AZ-2] 05/27/1999
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8] 05/27/1999
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50] 05/27/1999
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 05/27/1999
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 05/27/1999
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4] 06/10/1999
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 06/10/1999
Rep. Hoyer, Steny H. [D-MD-5] 06/10/1999
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 06/10/1999
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 06/10/1999
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 06/22/1999
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 06/22/1999
Rep. Obey, David R. [D-WI-7] 06/22/1999
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6] 06/22/1999
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9] 06/22/1999
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 06/22/1999
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 06/22/1999
Rep. Pickett, Owen B. [D-VA-2] 07/01/1999
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 07/16/1999
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8] 07/22/1999
Rep. Christensen, Donna MC [D-VI-At Large] 08/04/1999
Rep. Sandlin, Max [D-TX-1] 08/04/1999
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 09/09/1999
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 09/09/1999
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 09/09/1999
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3] 09/14/1999
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 09/22/1999
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 09/29/1999
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1] 10/01/1999
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 10/05/1999
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 10/07/1999
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 10/12/1999
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1] 10/21/1999
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1] 02/09/2000
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 03/01/2000
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8] 03/01/2000
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 05/04/2000
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 05/17/2000
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 05/17/2000
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 06/20/2000
Rep. Hastings, Alcee L. [D-FL-23] 07/27/2000
Rep. Fletcher, Ernie [R-KY-6] 07/27/2000
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 07/27/2000
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 07/27/2000
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 07/27/2000
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10] 07/27/2000
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1] 07/27/2000
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 09/06/2000
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 09/19/2000