Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Christensen, Donna MC [D-VI-At Large]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 04/29/1999
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Dingell, John D. [D-MI-16]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31]* 04/29/1999
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 04/29/1999
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Roemer, Tim [D-IN-3]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2] 05/04/1999
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12] 05/04/1999
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 05/04/1999
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18] 05/11/1999
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 05/11/1999
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2] 05/11/1999
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 05/25/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 05/25/1999
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35] 05/25/1999
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2] 05/25/1999
Rep. Sisisky, Norman [D-VA-4] 05/25/1999
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14] 06/16/1999
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12] 06/16/1999
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 06/16/1999
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5] 07/27/1999
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 10/04/1999
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/26/1999