Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Sununu, John E. [R-NH-1]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Coburn, Tom [R-OK-2]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Shadegg, John B. [R-AZ-4]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Ryun, Jim [R-KS-2]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Bartlett, Roscoe G. [R-MD-6]* 04/29/1999
Rep. DeLay, Tom [R-TX-22]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7]* 04/29/1999
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 04/29/1999
Rep. Armey, Richard K. [R-TX-26] 05/05/1999
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5] 05/05/1999
Rep. Collins, Mac [R-GA-3] 05/05/1999
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 05/05/1999
Rep. Petri, Thomas E. [R-WI-6] 05/18/1999
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 05/19/1999
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 05/24/1999
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/27/1999
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 06/09/1999
Rep. Stearns, Cliff [R-FL-6] 06/15/1999
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 06/17/1999
Rep. Tancredo, Thomas G. [R-CO-6] 06/17/1999
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 07/29/1999
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 08/03/1999
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 11/18/1999