Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Bachus, Spencer [R-AL-6]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Smith, Lamar [R-TX-21]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Crane, Philip M. [R-IL-8]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11]* 05/04/1999
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Scott, Robert C. "Bobby" [D-VA-3]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Taylor, Charles H. [R-NC-11]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 05/13/1999
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 05/13/1999
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12] 05/13/1999
Rep. Christensen, Donna MC [D-VI-At Large] 05/13/1999
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 05/13/1999
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 05/13/1999
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3] 05/13/1999
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2] 05/20/1999
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 05/20/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 05/20/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 05/20/1999
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/20/1999
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 05/20/1999
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 05/20/1999
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 05/20/1999
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 05/20/1999
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 05/27/1999
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48] 05/27/1999
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 05/27/1999
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 06/09/1999
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 06/09/1999
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 06/09/1999
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12] 06/09/1999
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8] 06/09/1999
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5] 06/09/1999
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 06/09/1999
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 06/14/1999
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44] 06/14/1999
Rep. Coble, Howard [R-NC-6] 06/17/1999
Rep. Paul, Ron [R-TX-14] 06/17/1999