There are 6 versions of this bill. View text

Click the check-box to add or remove the section, click the text link to scroll to that section.
Titles Actions Overview All Actions Cosponsors Committees Related Bills Subjects Latest Summary All Summaries

Titles (5)

Short Titles

Short Titles as Enacted

National Medal of Honor Memorial Act

Short Titles - House of Representatives

Short Titles as Passed House

National Medal of Honor Memorial Act

Short Titles as Reported to House

National Medal of Honor Memorial Act

Short Titles as Introduced

National Medal of Honor Memorial Act

Official Titles

Official Titles - House of Representatives

Official Title as Introduced

To designate as a national memorial the memorial being built at the Riverside National Cemetery in Riverside, California to honor recipients of the Medal of Honor.


Actions Overview (8)

Date
10/28/1999Became Public Law No: 106-83. (TXT | PDF)
10/28/1999Signed by President.
10/21/1999Presented to President.
10/20/1999Passed/agreed to in Senate: Passed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
10/20/1999Senate Committee on Armed Services discharged by Unanimous Consent.(consideration: CR S12947)
10/05/1999Passed/agreed to in House: On motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 424 - 0 (Roll no. 474).(text: CR H9313-9315)
09/30/1999Reported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 106-351.
05/04/1999Introduced in House

All Actions (24)

Date Chamber
10/28/1999Became Public Law No: 106-83. (TXT | PDF)
10/28/1999Signed by President.
10/21/1999HousePresented to President.
10/21/1999SenateMessage on Senate action sent to the House.
10/20/1999SenatePassed Senate without amendment by Unanimous Consent.
10/20/1999SenateSenate Committee on Armed Services discharged by Unanimous Consent. (consideration: CR S12947)
10/06/1999SenateReceived in the Senate and read twice and referred to the Committee on Armed Services.
10/05/1999-12:50pmHouseThe title of the measure was amended. Agreed to without objection.
10/05/1999-12:50pmHouseMotion to reconsider laid on the table Agreed to without objection.
10/05/1999-12:50pmHouseOn motion to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended Agreed to by the Yeas and Nays: (2/3 required): 424 - 0 (Roll no. 474). (text: CR H9313-9315)
10/05/1999-12:35pmHouseConsidered as unfinished business. (consideration: CR H9338-9339)
10/05/1999-10:50amHouseAt the conclusion of debate, the Yeas and Nays were demanded and ordered. Pursuant to the provisions of clause 8, rule XX, the Chair announced that further proceedings on the motion would be postponed.
10/05/1999-10:36amHouseDEBATE - The House proceeded with forty minutes of debate on H.R. 1663.
10/05/1999-10:36amHouseConsidered under suspension of the rules. (consideration: CR H9312-9315
10/05/1999-10:36amHouseMr. Stump moved to suspend the rules and pass the bill, as amended.
09/30/1999HousePlaced on the House Calendar, Calendar No. 122.
09/30/1999HouseReported (Amended) by the Committee on Veterans' Affairs. H. Rept. 106-351.
09/22/1999HouseOrdered to be Reported (Amended) by Voice Vote.
09/22/1999HouseCommittee Consideration and Mark-up Session Held.
09/22/1999HouseSubcommittee on Benefits Discharged.
06/16/1999HouseSubcommittee Hearings Held.
Action By: House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Benefits
05/20/1999HouseReferred to the Subcommittee on Benefits.
Action By: Committee on Veterans' Affairs
05/04/1999HouseReferred to the House Committee on Veterans' Affairs.
05/04/1999HouseIntroduced in House

Cosponsors (81)

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Bono, Mary [R-CA-44]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49]* 05/04/1999
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Kuykendall, Steven T. [R-CA-36]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 05/04/1999
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/09/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 06/09/1999
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 06/09/1999
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/09/1999
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 06/09/1999
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 06/18/1999
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1] 09/08/1999
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 09/09/1999
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/28/1999
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 09/28/1999
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 09/28/1999
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 09/28/1999

Committees (2)

Committees, subcommittees and links to reports associated with this bill are listed here, as well as the nature and date of committee activity and Congressional report number.

Committee / Subcommittee Date Activity Reports
House Veterans' Affairs05/04/1999 Referred to
09/22/1999 Markup by
09/30/1999 Reported by H. Rept. 106-351
House Veterans' Affairs Subcommittee on Benefits05/20/1999 Referred to
06/16/1999 Hearings by
09/22/1999 Discharged from
Senate Armed Services10/06/1999 Referred to
10/20/1999 Discharged from

No related bill information was received for H.R.1663.


Subjects (15)


Latest Summary (3)

There are 3 summaries for H.R.1663. View summaries

Shown Here:
Passed House amended (10/05/1999)

National Medal of Honor Memorial Act - Recognizes the following sites as National Medal of Honor sites: (1) the memorial under construction at Riverside National Cemetery, California; (2) the memorial at White River State Park in Indianapolis, Indiana; and (3) the Congressional Medal of Honor Museum at Patriots Point in Mount Pleasant, South Carolina, currently situated on the ex-U.S.S. Yorktown.