Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Bono Mack, Mary [R-CA-44]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Lewis, Jerry [R-CA-40]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Packard, Ron [R-CA-48]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Dreier, David [R-CA-28]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Rohrabacher, Dana [R-CA-45]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Cunningham, Randy (Duke) [R-CA-51]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Hunter, Duncan [R-CA-52]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49]* 05/04/1999
Rep. McKeon, Howard P. "Buck" [R-CA-25]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Thomas, William M. [R-CA-21]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Kuykendall, Steven T. [R-CA-36]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Pombo, Richard W. [R-CA-11]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Rogan, James E. [R-CA-27]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Gallegly, Elton [R-CA-23]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Dooley, Calvin M. [D-CA-20]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Buyer, Steve [R-IN-5]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Herger, Wally [R-CA-2]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2]* 05/04/1999
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Hansen, James V. [R-UT-1]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large]* 05/04/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 06/09/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 06/09/1999
Rep. Pitts, Joseph R. [R-PA-16] 06/09/1999
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/09/1999
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 06/09/1999
Rep. Hayworth, J. D. [R-AZ-6] 06/18/1999
Rep. Sanford, Marshall (Mark) [R-SC-1] 09/08/1999
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 09/09/1999
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3] 09/28/1999
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 09/28/1999
Rep. Everett, Terry [R-AL-2] 09/28/1999
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 09/28/1999