Text: H.R.1663 — 106th Congress (1999-2000)All Information (Except Text)

Text available as:

Shown Here:
Public Law No: 106-83 (10/28/1999)

 
[106th Congress Public Law 83]
[From the U.S. Government Printing Office]


<DOC>
[DOCID: f:publ083.106]


[[Page 113 STAT. 1293]]

Public Law 106-83
106th Congress

                                 An Act


 
 To <<NOTE: Oct. 28, 1999 -  [H.R. 1663]>> recognize National Medal of 
         Honor sites in California, Indiana, and South Carolina.

    Be it enacted by the Senate and House of Representatives of the 
United States of America in Congress <<NOTE: National Medal of Honor 
Memorial Act. 16 USC 431 note.>> assembled,

SECTION 1. SHORT TITLE.

    This Act may be cited as the ``National Medal of Honor 
Memorial Act''.

SEC. 2. FINDINGS.

    Congress makes the following findings:
            (1) The Medal of Honor is the highest military decoration 
        which the Nation bestows.
            (2) The Medal of Honor is the only military decoration given 
        in the name of Congress, and therefore on behalf of the people 
        of the United States.
            (3) The Congressional Medal of Honor Society was established 
        by an Act of Congress in 1958, and continues to protect, uphold, 
        and preserve the dignity, honor, and name of the Medal of Honor 
        and of the individual recipients of the Medal of Honor.
            (4) The Congressional Medal of Honor Society is composed 
        solely of recipients of the Medal of Honor.

SEC. 3. NATIONAL MEDAL OF HONOR SITES.

    (a) Recognition.--The following sites to honor recipients of the 
Medal of Honor are hereby recognized as National Medal of Honor sites:
            (1) Riverside, california.--The memorial under construction 
        at the Riverside National Cemetery in Riverside, California, to 
        be dedicated on November 5, 1999.
            (2) Indianapolis, indiana.--The memorial at the White River 
        State Park in Indianapolis, Indiana, dedicated on May 28, 1999.
            (3) Mount pleasant, south carolina.--The Congressional Medal 
        of Honor Museum at Patriots Point in Mount Pleasant, South 
        Carolina, currently situated on the ex-U.S.S. Yorktown (CV-6).

[[Page 113 STAT. 1294]]

    (b) Interpretation.--This section shall not be construed to require 
or permit Federal funds (other than any provided for as of the date of 
the enactment of this Act) to be expended for any purpose related to the 
sites recognized in subsection (a).

    Approved October 28, 1999.

LEGISLATIVE HISTORY--H.R. 1663:
---------------------------------------------------------------------------

HOUSE REPORTS: No. 106-351 (Comm. on Veterans' Affairs).
CONGRESSIONAL RECORD, Vol. 145 (1999):
            Oct. 5, considered and passed House.
            Oct. 20, considered and passed Senate.

                                  <all>