Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Combest, Larry [R-TX-19]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 01/06/1999
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Barrett, Bill [R-NE-3]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Thune, John [R-SD-At Large]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Smith, Nick [R-MI-7]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Manzullo, Donald A. [R-IL-16]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Lewis, Ron [R-KY-2]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Canady, Charles T. [R-FL-12]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Nethercutt, George R., Jr. [R-WA-5]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Lucas, Frank D. [R-OK-6] 01/19/1999
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 01/19/1999
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 01/19/1999
Rep. Skelton, Ike [D-MO-4] 02/04/1999
Rep. John, Christopher [D-LA-7] 02/04/1999
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 02/09/1999
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 02/09/1999
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 02/09/1999
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 02/09/1999
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 02/09/1999
Rep. Hill, Rick [R-MT-At Large] 02/11/1999
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19] 02/11/1999
Rep. Latham, Tom [R-IA-5] 02/11/1999
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 02/11/1999
Rep. Boswell, Leonard L. [D-IA-3] 02/23/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 02/23/1999
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 02/25/1999
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 03/02/1999
Rep. Blunt, Roy [R-MO-7] 03/02/1999
Rep. Turner, Jim [D-TX-2] 03/02/1999
Rep. Nussle, Jim [R-IA-2] 03/23/1999
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 04/12/1999
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 04/20/1999
Rep. Hulshof, Kenny C. [R-MO-9] 06/08/1999
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 06/08/1999
Rep. Brady, Kevin [R-TX-8] 06/09/1999
Rep. Pomeroy, Earl [D-ND-At Large] 06/10/1999
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 06/14/1999