Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Condit, Gary A. [D-CA-18]* 01/06/1999
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 03/10/1999
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 03/10/1999
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 03/10/1999
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 03/10/1999
Rep. Underwood, Robert A. [D-GU-At Large] 03/10/1999
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 03/10/1999
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 03/10/1999
Rep. Quinn, Jack [R-NY-30] 03/10/1999
Rep. Cooksey, John [R-LA-5] 03/10/1999
Rep. Kasich, John R. [R-OH-12] 03/10/1999
Rep. Bilirakis, Michael [R-FL-9] 03/10/1999
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5] 03/10/1999
Rep. Danner, Pat [D-MO-6] 03/10/1999
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 03/10/1999
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1] 03/10/1999
Rep. Castle, Michael N. [R-DE-At Large] 03/10/1999
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 03/10/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 03/10/1999
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 03/10/1999
Rep. Wamp, Zach [R-TN-3] 03/10/1999
Rep. Stenholm, Charles W. [D-TX-17] 03/10/1999
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28] 03/10/1999
Rep. Salmon, Matt [R-AZ-1] 03/10/1999
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8] 03/10/1999
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 03/10/1999
Rep. Frost, Martin [D-TX-24] 03/10/1999
Rep. Bishop, Sanford D., Jr. [D-GA-2] 03/10/1999
Rep. Bilbray, Brian P. [R-CA-49] 03/10/1999
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 03/10/1999
Rep. Thurman, Karen L. [D-FL-5] 03/10/1999
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33] 03/10/1999
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6] 03/10/1999
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 03/10/1999
Rep. Hinchey, Maurice D. [D-NY-26] 03/10/1999
Rep. Pelosi, Nancy [D-CA-8] 03/10/1999
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29] 03/10/1999
Rep. Faleomavaega, Eni F. H. [D-AS-At Large] 03/10/1999
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13] 03/10/1999
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10] 03/10/1999
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 03/10/1999
Rep. Tanner, John S. [D-TN-8] 03/10/1999
Rep. Wise, Robert E., Jr. [D-WV-2] 03/10/1999
Rep. Bentsen, Ken [D-TX-25] 03/10/1999
Rep. Christensen, Donna MC [D-VI-At Large] 03/10/1999
Rep. Boyd, Allen [D-FL-2] 03/10/1999
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1] 03/10/1999
Rep. Shows, Ronnie [D-MS-4] 03/10/1999
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4] 03/10/1999
Rep. Taylor, Gene [D-MS-5] 03/10/1999
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22] 03/10/1999
Rep. Gibbons, Jim [R-NV-2] 03/10/1999
Rep. Frelinghuysen, Rodney P. [R-NJ-11] 03/10/1999
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1] 03/10/1999
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 03/10/1999
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 03/10/1999
Rep. Ganske, Greg [R-IA-4] 03/10/1999
Rep. Ramstad, Jim [R-MN-3] 03/10/1999
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 03/10/1999
Rep. Cook, Merrill [R-UT-2] 03/10/1999
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 03/10/1999
Rep. Gekas, George W. [R-PA-17] 03/10/1999
Rep. Gillmor, Paul E. [R-OH-5] 03/10/1999
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 03/10/1999
Rep. Weller, Jerry [R-IL-11] 03/10/1999
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 03/10/1999
Rep. Bereuter, Doug [R-NE-1] 03/10/1999
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3] 03/10/1999
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 03/10/1999
Rep. Johnson, Nancy L. [R-CT-6] 03/10/1999
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 03/10/1999
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19] 03/10/1999
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 03/10/1999
Rep. Oxley, Michael G. [R-OH-4] 03/10/1999
Rep. Foley, Mark [R-FL-16] 03/10/1999
Rep. Kolbe, Jim [R-AZ-5] 03/10/1999
Rep. Emerson, Jo Ann [R-MO-8] 03/10/1999
Rep. Watkins, Wes [R-OK-3] 03/10/1999
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6] 03/10/1999
Rep. Ewing, Thomas W. [R-IL-15] 03/10/1999
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 03/10/1999
Rep. Ehlers, Vernon J. [R-MI-3] 03/10/1999
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 03/10/1999
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 03/10/1999
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 03/10/1999
Rep. Pryce, Deborah [R-OH-15] 03/10/1999
Rep. Edwards, Chet [D-TX-11] 03/10/1999
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 03/10/1999
Rep. Young, Don [R-AK-At Large] 03/10/1999
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4] 03/10/1999
Rep. Miller, Gary G. [R-CA-41] 03/10/1999
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 03/10/1999
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 03/10/1999
Rep. Doyle, Michael F. [D-PA-18] 03/10/1999
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 03/10/1999
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13] 03/10/1999
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8] 03/10/1999
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 03/10/1999
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9] 03/10/1999
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42] 03/10/1999
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5] 03/10/1999
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2] 03/18/1999
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9] 03/18/1999
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 03/18/1999
Rep. Bliley, Tom [R-VA-7] 03/18/1999
Rep. Ehrlich, Robert L., Jr. [R-MD-2] 03/18/1999
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 03/18/1999
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9] 03/18/1999
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 03/18/1999
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 03/18/1999
Rep. Bryant, Ed [R-TN-7] 03/18/1999
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12] 03/18/1999
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 03/18/1999
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 03/24/1999
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3] 03/24/1999
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17] 03/24/1999
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 03/24/1999
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24] 03/24/1999
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32] 03/24/1999
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10] 03/25/1999
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7] 03/25/1999
Rep. Stump, Bob [R-AZ-3] 03/25/1999
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 04/20/1999
Rep. Kuykendall, Steven T. [R-CA-36] 04/20/1999
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1] 04/20/1999
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 04/20/1999
Rep. Duncan, John J., Jr. [R-TN-2] 04/20/1999
Rep. Cramer, Robert E. (Bud), Jr. [D-AL-5] 04/20/1999
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9] 04/20/1999
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 05/18/1999
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15] 05/18/1999
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12] 05/18/1999
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large] 05/18/1999
Rep. Camp, Dave [R-MI-4] 05/26/1999
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6] 05/26/1999
Rep. Calvert, Ken [R-CA-43] 06/16/1999
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5] 07/19/1999
Rep. Gordon, Bart [D-TN-6] 07/29/1999
Rep. Davis, Jim [D-FL-11] 07/29/1999
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21] 07/29/1999
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9] 07/29/1999
Rep. Royce, Edward R. [R-CA-39] 08/04/1999
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3] 09/08/1999
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 09/08/1999
Rep. Lucas, Ken [D-KY-4] 09/08/1999
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 09/28/1999
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29] 09/30/1999
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3] 10/21/1999