Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1]* 05/05/1999
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2]* 05/05/1999
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 05/05/1999
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 05/05/1999
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6]* 05/05/1999
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7]* 05/05/1999
Rep. Oberstar, James L. [D-MN-8]* 05/05/1999
Rep. Rahall, Nick J., II [D-WV-3]* 05/05/1999
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 05/25/1999
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2] 05/26/1999
Rep. McInnis, Scott [R-CO-3] 06/18/1999
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 07/29/1999
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 05/22/2000