Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Ackerman, Gary L. [D-NY-5]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Allen, Thomas H. [D-ME-1]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Andrews, Robert E. [D-NJ-1]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Baldwin, Tammy [D-WI-2]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Barrett, Thomas M. [D-WI-5]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Berman, Howard L. [D-CA-26]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Blagojevich, Rod R. [D-IL-5]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Bonior, David E. [D-MI-10]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Borski, Robert A. [D-PA-3]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Boucher, Rick [D-VA-9]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Brown, Corrine [D-FL-3]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Brown, George E., Jr. [D-CA-42]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Brown, Sherrod [D-OH-13]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Capps, Lois [D-CA-22]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Capuano, Michael E. [D-MA-8]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Clay, William (Bill) [D-MO-1]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Conyers, John, Jr. [D-MI-14]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Costello, Jerry F. [D-IL-12]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Coyne, William J. [D-PA-14]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Crowley, Joseph [D-NY-7]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Davis, Danny K. [D-IL-7]* 05/06/1999
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4]* 05/06/1999
Rep. DeGette, Diana [D-CO-1]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Delahunt, William D. [D-MA-10]* 05/06/1999
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Deutsch, Peter [D-FL-20]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Dicks, Norman D. [D-WA-6]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Dixon, Julian C. [D-CA-32]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Engel, Eliot L. [D-NY-17]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Eshoo, Anna G. [D-CA-14]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Evans, Lane [D-IL-17]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Farr, Sam [D-CA-17]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Filner, Bob [D-CA-50]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Frank, Barney [D-MA-4]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Gejdenson, Sam [D-CT-2]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Gutierrez, Luis V. [D-IL-4]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Hall, Tony P. [D-OH-3]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Hoeffel, Joseph M. [D-PA-13]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Holt, Rush [D-NJ-12]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Inslee, Jay [D-WA-1]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Jackson, Jesse L., Jr. [D-IL-2]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Jackson-Lee, Sheila [D-TX-18]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Jefferson, William J. [D-LA-2]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Kennedy, Patrick J. [D-RI-1]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Kildee, Dale E. [D-MI-9]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Kilpatrick, Carolyn C. [D-MI-15]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Kleczka, Gerald D. [D-WI-4]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Kucinich, Dennis J. [D-OH-10]* 05/06/1999
Rep. LaFalce, John J. [D-NY-29]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Lampson, Nick [D-TX-9]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Lantos, Tom [D-CA-12]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Larson, John B. [D-CT-1]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Levin, Sander M. [D-MI-12]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Lewis, John [D-GA-5]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Lipinski, William O. [D-IL-3]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Lofgren, Zoe [D-CA-16]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Lowey, Nita M. [D-NY-18]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Luther, Bill [D-MN-6]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Maloney, Carolyn B. [D-NY-14]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Maloney, James H. [D-CT-5]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Markey, Edward J. [D-MA-7]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Martinez, Matthew G. [D-CA-31]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Matsui, Robert T. [D-CA-5]* 05/06/1999
Rep. McCarthy, Carolyn [D-NY-4]* 05/06/1999
Rep. McDermott, Jim [D-WA-7]* 05/06/1999
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3]* 05/06/1999
Rep. McKinney, Cynthia A. [D-GA-4]* 05/06/1999
Rep. McNulty, Michael R. [D-NY-21]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Meehan, Martin T. [D-MA-5]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Meek, Carrie P. [D-FL-17]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Meeks, Gregory W. [D-NY-6]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Menendez, Robert [D-NJ-13]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Moakley, John Joseph [D-MA-9]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Moran, James P. [D-VA-8]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Murtha, John P. [D-PA-12]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Nadler, Jerrold [D-NY-8]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Neal, Richard E. [D-MA-2]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Olver, John W. [D-MA-1]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Pallone, Frank, Jr. [D-NJ-6]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Pascrell, Bill, Jr. [D-NJ-8]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Payne, Donald M. [D-NJ-10]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Phelps, David D. [D-IL-19]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Price, David E. [D-NC-4]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Rothman, Steven R. [D-NJ-9]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Roybal-Allard, Lucille [D-CA-33]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Rush, Bobby L. [D-IL-1]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Sabo, Martin Olav [D-MN-5]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Sanchez, Loretta [D-CA-46]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Sanders, Bernard [I-VT-At Large]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Sawyer, Tom [D-OH-14]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Schakowsky, Janice D. [D-IL-9]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Serrano, Jose E. [D-NY-16]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Sherman, Brad [D-CA-24]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Slaughter, Louise McIntosh [D-NY-28]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Smith, Adam [D-WA-9]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Spratt, John M., Jr. [D-SC-5]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Stabenow, Debbie [D-MI-8]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Stark, Fortney Pete [D-CA-13]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Tauscher, Ellen O. [D-CA-10]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Tierney, John F. [D-MA-6]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Towns, Edolphus [D-NY-10]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Udall, Mark [D-CO-2]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Udall, Tom [D-NM-3]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Velazquez, Nydia M. [D-NY-12]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Vento, Bruce F. [D-MN-4]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Waters, Maxine [D-CA-35]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Waxman, Henry A. [D-CA-29]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Weiner, Anthony D. [D-NY-9]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Wexler, Robert [D-FL-19]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Weygand, Robert A. [D-RI-2]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Woolsey, Lynn C. [D-CA-6]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Wynn, Albert Russell [D-MD-4]* 05/06/1999
Rep. Gonzalez, Charles A. [D-TX-20] 05/20/1999
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 05/20/1999
Rep. Wu, David [D-OR-1] 05/20/1999
Rep. Berkley, Shelley [D-NV-1] 06/16/1999
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 06/16/1999
Rep. Thompson, Mike [D-CA-1] 06/24/1999
Rep. Peterson, Collin C. [D-MN-7] 07/14/1999
Rep. Abercrombie, Neil [D-HI-1] 09/23/1999
Rep. Hill, Baron P. [D-IN-9] 09/23/1999
Rep. Hilliard, Earl F. [D-AL-7] 09/23/1999
Rep. Jones, Stephanie Tubbs [D-OH-11] 09/23/1999
Rep. Brady, Robert A. [D-PA-1] 09/29/1999
Rep. Johnson, Eddie Bernice [D-TX-30] 09/29/1999
Rep. Kind, Ron [D-WI-3] 10/07/1999
Rep. Watt, Melvin L. [D-NC-12] 10/07/1999
Rep. Carson, Julia [D-IN-10] 11/03/1999
Rep. Rangel, Charles B. [D-NY-15] 11/03/1999
Rep. Reyes, Silvestre [D-TX-16] 11/03/1999
Rep. Becerra, Xavier [D-CA-30] 11/17/1999
Rep. Kaptur, Marcy [D-OH-9] 11/17/1999
Rep. Millender-McDonald, Juanita [D-CA-37] 11/22/1999
Rep. Klink, Ron [D-PA-4] 01/31/2000
Rep. McCarthy, Karen [D-MO-5] 02/16/2000
Rep. Biggert, Judy [R-IL-13] 02/29/2000
Rep. Strickland, Ted [D-OH-6] 03/02/2000
Rep. Ford, Harold E., Jr. [D-TN-9] 03/23/2000
Rep. Saxton, Jim [R-NJ-3] 05/15/2000
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 05/22/2000
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 06/06/2000
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 09/07/2000
Rep. Roukema, Marge [R-NJ-5] 09/28/2000
Rep. Cardin, Benjamin L. [D-MD-3] 10/10/2000
Rep. Norton, Eleanor Holmes [D-DC-At Large] 10/25/2000

Show cosponsors who withdrew