Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. Shays, Christopher [R-CT-4]* 05/11/1999
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24]* 05/11/1999
Rep. Mica, John L. [R-FL-7]* 05/11/1999
Rep. McIntosh, David M. [R-IN-2]* 05/11/1999
Rep. Souder, Mark E. [R-IN-4]* 05/11/1999
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19]* 05/11/1999
Rep. Hutchinson, Asa [R-AR-3]* 05/11/1999
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17]* 05/11/1999
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38]* 05/11/1999
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20]* 05/11/1999
Rep. Barr, Bob [R-GA-7]* 05/11/1999
Rep. Ryan, Paul [R-WI-1]* 05/11/1999
Rep. Hall, Ralph M. [D-TX-4] 05/26/1999
Rep. Hastings, Doc [R-WA-4] 05/26/1999
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 05/26/1999
Rep. Rivers, Lynn N. [D-MI-13] 05/26/1999
Rep. Bass, Charles F. [R-NH-2] 05/26/1999
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 06/10/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 07/19/1999
Rep. Doolittle, John T. [R-CA-4] 07/19/1999
Rep. LaHood, Ray [R-IL-18] 07/19/1999
Rep. Sessions, Pete [R-TX-5] 07/19/1999
Rep. Spence, Floyd [R-SC-2] 07/19/1999
Rep. Davis, Tom [R-VA-11] 07/19/1999
Rep. Bateman, Herbert H. [R-VA-1] 07/29/1999
Rep. Scarborough, Joe [R-FL-1] 07/29/1999
Rep. Dickey, Jay [R-AR-4] 07/29/1999
Rep. Linder, John [R-GA-11] 07/29/1999
Rep. Largent, Steve [R-OK-1] 07/29/1999
Rep. Green, Mark [R-WI-8] 07/29/1999
Rep. DeMint, Jim [R-SC-4] 07/29/1999
Rep. Toomey, Patrick J. [R-PA-15] 07/29/1999
Rep. Johnson, Sam [R-TX-3] 07/29/1999
Rep. Deal, Nathan [R-GA-9] 07/29/1999
Rep. Weldon, Dave [R-FL-15] 07/29/1999
Rep. Chenoweth-Hage, Helen [R-ID-1] 07/29/1999
Rep. Miller, Dan [R-FL-13] 07/29/1999
Rep. Myrick, Sue Wilkins [R-NC-9] 07/30/1999
Rep. Porter, John Edward [R-IL-10] 07/30/1999
Rep. Schaffer, Bob [R-CO-4] 07/30/1999
Rep. Chambliss, Saxby [R-GA-8] 08/02/1999
Rep. Hostettler, John N. [R-IN-8] 08/04/1999
Rep. Vitter, David [R-LA-1] 08/04/1999
Rep. Terry, Lee [R-NE-2] 08/04/1999
Rep. Radanovich, George [R-CA-19] 09/08/1999
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 09/08/1999
Rep. Watts, J. C., Jr. [R-OK-4] 09/13/1999
Rep. Graham, Lindsey [R-SC-3] 09/13/1999
Rep. Sensenbrenner, F. James, Jr. [R-WI-9] 09/13/1999
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 02/08/2000
Rep. Goss, Porter J. [R-FL-14] 02/10/2000
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 02/16/2000
Rep. Cox, Christopher [R-CA-47] 02/16/2000
Rep. Hefley, Joel [R-CO-5] 02/16/2000
Rep. Goodling, William F. [R-PA-19] 02/16/2000
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 02/16/2000
Rep. Walden, Greg [R-OR-2] 03/01/2000
Rep. Boehner, John A. [R-OH-8] 03/01/2000
Rep. Ose, Doug [R-CA-3] 03/08/2000
Rep. Gutknecht, Gil [R-MN-1] 03/08/2000
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 03/15/2000