Refine your search

* = Original cosponsor
CosponsorDate Cosponsored
Rep. LaTourette, Steven C. [R-OH-19] 06/08/1999
Rep. Barcia, James A. [D-MI-5] 06/08/1999
Rep. Etheridge, Bob [D-NC-2] 06/08/1999
Rep. Ney, Robert W. [R-OH-18] 06/08/1999
Rep. McGovern, James P. [D-MA-3] 06/08/1999
Rep. Horn, Stephen [R-CA-38] 06/08/1999
Rep. McHugh, John M. [R-NY-24] 06/08/1999
Rep. Hooley, Darlene [D-OR-5] 06/08/1999
Rep. Green, Gene [D-TX-29] 06/10/1999
Rep. Cummings, Elijah E. [D-MD-7] 06/10/1999
Rep. Minge, David [D-MN-2] 06/17/1999
Rep. Lee, Barbara [D-CA-9] 06/18/1999
Rep. Morella, Constance A. [R-MD-8] 06/24/1999
Rep. Moran, Jerry [R-KS-1] 07/01/1999
Rep. Baldacci, John Elias [D-ME-2] 07/01/1999
Rep. Houghton, Amo [R-NY-31] 07/16/1999
Rep. Leach, James A. [R-IA-1] 07/16/1999
Rep. Boehlert, Sherwood [R-NY-23] 07/16/1999
Rep. Owens, Major R. [D-NY-11] 07/16/1999
Rep. Forbes, Michael P. [R-NY-1] 07/16/1999
Rep. Gilman, Benjamin A. [R-NY-20] 07/22/1999
Rep. Metcalf, Jack [R-WA-2] 07/22/1999
Rep. Miller, George [D-CA-7] 07/22/1999
Rep. Sherwood, Don [R-PA-10] 07/22/1999
Rep. Walsh, James T. [R-NY-25] 07/22/1999
Rep. Diaz-Balart, Lincoln [R-FL-21] 07/29/1999
Rep. King, Peter T. [R-NY-3] 07/29/1999
Rep. Baird, Brian [D-WA-3] 07/29/1999
Rep. Sweeney, John E. [R-NY-22] 07/29/1999
Rep. Holden, Tim [D-PA-6] 07/29/1999
Rep. Gilchrest, Wayne T. [R-MD-1] 08/05/1999
Rep. Mink, Patsy T. [D-HI-2] 08/05/1999
Rep. Kuykendall, Steven T. [R-CA-36] 08/05/1999
Rep. Ros-Lehtinen, Ileana [R-FL-18] 08/05/1999
Rep. Snyder, Vic [D-AR-2] 08/05/1999
Rep. Clyburn, James E. [D-SC-6] 09/08/1999
Rep. Thompson, Bennie G. [D-MS-2] 09/08/1999
Rep. DeFazio, Peter A. [D-OR-4] 09/08/1999
Rep. Weldon, Curt [R-PA-7] 09/08/1999
Rep. Franks, Bob [R-NJ-7] 09/08/1999
Rep. Shimkus, John [R-IL-20] 09/08/1999
Rep. Traficant, James A., Jr. [D-OH-17] 09/09/1999
Rep. LoBiondo, Frank A. [R-NJ-2] 09/09/1999
Rep. English, Phil [R-PA-21] 09/21/1999
Rep. Smith, Christopher H. [R-NJ-4] 09/21/1999
Rep. Moore, Dennis [D-KS-3] 09/21/1999
Rep. Greenwood, James C. [R-PA-8] 09/21/1999
Rep. Lazio, Rick [R-NY-2] 09/21/1999
Rep. Campbell, Tom [R-CA-15] 10/26/1999
Rep. Kelly, Sue W. [R-NY-19] 10/26/1999
Rep. Upton, Fred [R-MI-6] 02/01/2000
Rep. DeLauro, Rosa L. [D-CT-3] 02/01/2000
Rep. McIntyre, Mike [D-NC-7] 02/01/2000
Rep. Isakson, Johnny [R-GA-6] 02/08/2000
Rep. Napolitano, Grace F. [D-CA-34] 02/16/2000
Rep. Simpson, Michael K. [R-ID-2] 02/16/2000
Rep. Baker, Richard H. [R-LA-6] 03/15/2000
Rep. Blumenauer, Earl [D-OR-3] 03/15/2000

Show cosponsors who withdrew